EP0416730 - Substrate preparation for chemical-species-specific binding [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304-1112 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto CA 94304-1112 / US | ||
Former [1991/11] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company Mail Stop 20 B-O, 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tom-Moy, May 3391 Brittan Avenue San Carlos, California 94070 / US | 02 /
Meyerholtz, Carl Alan 18644 Loree Avenue Cupertino, California 94070 / US | [1991/11] | Representative(s) | Colgan, Stephen James, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/11] | Colgan, Stephen James, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 90307981.2 | 20.07.1990 | [1991/11] | Priority number, date | US19890404721 | 08.09.1989 Original published format: US 404721 | [1991/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0416730 | Date: | 13.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0416730 | Date: | 01.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0416730 | Date: | 22.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/547, G01N33/552, G01N29/18, // C12Q1/68, G01N33/68 | [1991/11] | CPC: |
G01N33/54353 (EP);
G01N33/54373 (EP);
G01N33/552 (EP);
G01N2291/0256 (EP);
G01N2291/0422 (EP);
G01N2291/0427 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/11] | Title | German: | Herstellung einer Festphase, geeignet für spezifische Bindung chemischer Substanzen | [1991/11] | English: | Substrate preparation for chemical-species-specific binding | [1991/11] | French: | Préparation d'une phase solide liant spécifiquement des substances chimiques | [1991/11] | Examination procedure | 10.12.1992 | Examination requested [1993/05] | 01.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.11.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0138297 ; | [Y]EP0215669 ; | [X]EP0139489 ; | [X]WO8704794 ; | [A]EP0246846 | [X] - ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY vol. 59, no. 23, 1 December 1987, pages 2760 - 2763; MURAMATSU ET AL.: 'Piezoelectric crystal biosensor modified with protein A for determination of immunoglobulins' | [X] - ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY vol. 61, no. 11, 1 June 1989, pages 1227 - 1230; DAVIS ET AL.: 'Continuous liqiud-phase piezoelectric biosensor for kinetic immunoassays' |