EP0410749 - Anthocyanidins for the treatment of ophthalmic diseases [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IDB HOLDING S.p.A. Via Ripamonti, 99 I-20141 Milano / IT | [1991/11] |
Former [1991/05] | For all designated states * / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Magistretti, Maria Jose Via Tonale 9 I-20125 Milano / IT | 02 /
Conti, Marisa Via Lazio 5 I-20090 Pieve Emanuele MI / IT | 03 /
Pifferi, Giorgio Via C.A. Carlone 8 I-20147 Milano / IT | [1991/05] | Representative(s) | Ritter, Stephen David, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/05] | Ritter, Stephen David, et al Mathys & Squire 100 Grays Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 90308197.4 | 26.07.1990 | [1991/05] | Priority number, date | GB19890017323 | 28.07.1989 Original published format: GB 8917323 | [1991/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0410749 | Date: | 30.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0410749 | Date: | 03.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0410749 | Date: | 19.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/35 | [1991/05] | CPC: |
A61K31/35 (EP,KR,US);
A61P27/00 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/05] | Title | German: | Anthocyanidine zur Behandlung von Augenkrankheiten | [1991/05] | English: | Anthocyanidins for the treatment of ophthalmic diseases | [1991/05] | French: | Anthocyanidines pour le traitement des maladies ophtalmiques | [1991/05] | Examination procedure | 24.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/20] | 27.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.03.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.10.1994 | ES | 19.10.1994 | GR | 19.10.1994 | IT | 19.10.1994 | [2008/01] |
Former [2002/24] | AT | 19.10.1994 | |
ES | 19.10.1994 | ||
GR | 19.10.1994 | ||
IT | 19.10.1994 | ||
Former [2000/04] | AT | 19.10.1994 | |
GR | 19.10.1994 | ||
IT | 19.10.1994 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 19.10.1994 | |
IT | 19.10.1994 | ||
Former [1995/29] | AT | 19.10.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP55111418 ; | FR1369 [ ]; | BE864450R [ ] (INVERNI DELLA BEFFA SPA); | GB1589294 [ ] (INVERNI DELLA BEFFA SPA); | GB1595531 [ ] (FERODO SA); | EP0258476 [ ] (ALCON LAB INC [US]) | [A] - BIOCHEMICAL PHARMACOLOGY, vol. 25, no. 22, 1976, pages 2505-2513, Pergamon Press, GB; S.D. VARMA et al.: "Inhibition of lens aldose reductase by flavonoids - their possible role in the prevention of diabetic cataracts" | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 4, no. 173 (C-32)(655), 29th November 1980; & JP-A-55 111 418 (SANTEN SEIYAKU K.K.) 28-08-1980, & JP55111418 A 00000000 | [A] - H. WAGNER: "Pharmazeutische Biologie Drogen und ihre Inhaltsstoffe", 1980, pages 208-212, Gustav Fischer Verlag, Stuttgart, DE | [A] - C.R. SOC. BIOL., vol. 161, no. 12, 1967, pages 2473-2475; P. TRONCHE et al.: "Effet des glycosides d'anthocyanes sur la cinétique de régénération du pourpre rétinien chez le Lapin" | [A] - DIALOG INFORMATION SERVICES, file 155, medline 66-89/Nov., accession no. 00573568; K.V. TARASKINA et al.: "The production of leukoephdine and ephdine from mountain ephedra (ephedra equisetina) and study of their vitamin P activity", & MED. PROM SSSR, APR. 1966, 20(4), pages 27-9 |