EP0411881 - Partial oxidation of sewage sludge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.1994 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.10.1994 [1994/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEXACO DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION 2000 Westchester Avenue White Plains New York 10650 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/06] | For all designated states TEXACO DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION 2000 Westchester Avenue White Plains, New York 10650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McMahon, Matthew Aloysius 5 Dana Place Wappingers Falls, NY 12590 / US | 02 /
Suggitt, Robert Murray Rd. no. 6, Thompson Terrace Wappingers Falls, NY 12590 / US | 03 /
McKeon, Ronald James 171 North Walnut Street Beacon, NY 12508 / US | 04 /
Brent, Albert 269-23 Grand Central Parkway Floral Park, NY 11005 / US | [1991/06] | Representative(s) | Ben-Nathan, Laurence Albert, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 30 Welbeck Street London W1G 8ER / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/06] | Ben-Nathan, Laurence Albert, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 91 Wimpole Street London W1M 8AH / GB | Application number, filing date | 90308372.3 | 30.07.1990 | [1991/06] | Priority number, date | US19890389435 | 03.08.1989 Original published format: US 389435 | [1991/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0411881 | Date: | 06.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0411881 | Date: | 13.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C02F11/10, C10J3/46, C10B53/00 | [1991/06] | CPC: |
C10B53/00 (EP,US);
C02F11/10 (EP,US);
C10J3/46 (EP,US);
C10J3/466 (EP,US);
C10J2300/0906 (EP,US);
C10J2300/0923 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1991/06] | Title | German: | Teilweise Oxidation von Abwasserschlamm | [1991/06] | English: | Partial oxidation of sewage sludge | [1991/06] | French: | Oxydation partielle de boues résiduaires | [1991/06] | Examination procedure | 07.05.1991 | Examination requested [1991/27] | 30.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.04.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3544291 [ ] (SCHLINGER WARREN G, et al); | GB1371296 [ ] (TEXACO DEVELOPMENT CORP); | US4135888 [ ] (WALTRIP OWEN R); | US4166802 [ ] (RICHTER GEORGE N [US], et al); | US4321151 [ ] (MCMULLEN FREDERICK G); | EP0115118 [ ] (TEXACO DEVELOPMENT CORP [US]); | UST104901I [ ]; | US4525175 [ ] (STELLACCIO ROBERT J [US]); | US4592291 [ ] (SULLIVAN III DENNIS W [US]); | EP0244266 [ ] (MEI SYSTEMS INC [US]); | US4762527 [ ] (BESHORE DAVID G [US], et al); | US4801438 [ ] (NAJJAR MITRI S [US], et al); | US4933086 [ ] (MCMAHON MATTHEW A [US], et al) |