EP0412703 - Self-sealing tissue expander and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.08.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.10.1993 [1993/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton, NJ 08543 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/17] | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company 345 Park Avenue New York, N.Y. 10154 / US | ||
Former [1991/07] | For all designated states BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY 345 Park Avenue New York, N.Y. 10154 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bark, Jeffrey E. 207 Warbler Court Paso Robles, CA / US | 02 /
Hillegass, Donald V. 6300 West Mile Road Franksville WI / US | 03 /
Woodruff, Eric J. 1649 Chatham Street Racine, Wisconsin / US | [1991/07] | Representative(s) | Brown, David Alan, et al Mathys & Squire 100 Grays Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | [1991/07] | Application number, filing date | 90308387.1 | 31.07.1990 | [1991/07] | Priority number, date | US19890390267 | 07.08.1989 Original published format: US 390267 | [1991/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0412703 | Date: | 13.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/12, A61B19/00, A61L27/00, B29C41/22, B32B25/02 | [1991/07] | CPC: |
A61F2/12 (EP,US);
A61M25/00 (KR);
B32B7/12 (US);
A61L27/18 (EP,US);
B32B25/10 (EP,US);
B32B25/20 (US);
B32B2305/07 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61L27/18, A61F2/12, C08L83/04 (EP,US);
A61L27/18, C08L83/04 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/07] | Title | German: | Selbstschliessende Gewebedehneinrichtung und Verfahren | [1991/07] | English: | Self-sealing tissue expander and method | [1991/07] | French: | Dilatateur de tissu autoobturant et méthode | [1991/07] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 31.07.1991 | Examination requested [1991/39] | 14.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/42] | 27.05.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3681787 (PERRAS COLETTE); | [X]FR2199266 (LEGUEN ANDRE [FR]); | [YD]US4190040 (SCHULTE RUDOLF R [US]); | [X]GB2047101 (DOW CORNING); | [Y]EP0029292 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]); | [Y]EP0134340 (UNIV UTAH RES FOUND [US]); | [A]EP0181720 (MANDERS ERNEST K); | [A]US4592755 (PENTON HAROLD R [US], et al); | [AD]EP0196821 (PMT INC [US]); | [A]US4636213 (PAKIAM ANTHONY I [US]); | [A]US4671255 (DUBRUL WILLIAM R [US], et al); | [Y]EP0324234 |