EP0411933 - An active matrix display apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.08.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.10.1995 [1995/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 545-0013 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/06] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakazawa, Kiyoshi 1-12-18, Emisaka Fujidera-shi, Osaka / JP | 02 /
Katayama, Mikio 1879-51-704 Tawaraguchi-cho Ikoma-shi, Nara-ken / JP | 03 /
Kato, Hiroaki 1-9-4, Tezukayama Nara-shi, Nara-ken / JP | 04 /
Imaya, Akihiko 2-9-3-6, Rokujo-nishi Nara-shi, Nara-ken / JP | [1991/06] | Representative(s) | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/06] | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 90308491.1 | 01.08.1990 | [1991/06] | Priority number, date | JP19890201973 | 03.08.1989 Original published format: JP 20197389 | [1991/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0411933 | Date: | 06.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0411933 | Date: | 03.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0411933 | Date: | 26.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/36 | [1991/06] | CPC: |
G09G3/3655 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0223 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1991/06] | Title | German: | Aktives Matrixanzeigegerät | [1991/06] | English: | An active matrix display apparatus | [1991/06] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage à matrice active | [1991/06] | Examination procedure | 28.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 22.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 18.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 25.04.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2173628 (SHARP KK); | [A]EP0216188 (CANON KK [JP]) |