EP0412720 - A method of and apparatus for printing on metal sheets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.10.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.11.1995 [1995/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CRABTREE OF GATESHEAD LIMITED Kingsway, Team Valley Trading Estate Gateshead Tyne & Wear NE11 OSU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/07] | For all designated states CRABTREE OF GATESHEAD LIMITED Kingsway, Team Valley Trading Estate Gateshead, Tyne & Wear NE11 OSU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Southworth, Christopher John Morrison 82, Woodlands Road Shotley Bridge, County Durham / GB | [1991/07] | Representative(s) | Norcliffe, Kenneth Adrian 33, Delph Lane Netherton Huddersfield West Yorkshire, HD4 7JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/07] | Norcliffe, Kenneth Adrian 33, Delph Lane Netherton Huddersfield West Yorkshire, HD4 7JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 90308512.4 | 02.08.1990 | [1991/07] | Priority number, date | GB19890018175 | 09.08.1989 Original published format: GB 8918175 | [1991/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0412720 | Date: | 13.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0412720 | Date: | 08.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0412720 | Date: | 07.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B41F7/16, B41F21/12 | [1991/07] | CPC: |
B41F21/12 (EP);
B41F7/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1991/07] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Bedrucken von Metallplatten | [1991/07] | English: | A method of and apparatus for printing on metal sheets | [1991/07] | French: | Procédé et dispositif à imprimer sur des plaques métalliques | [1991/07] | Examination procedure | 16.10.1991 | Examination requested [1991/52] | 13.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.04.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2699941 ; | [A]US2809831 |