EP0414403 - Pressure actuator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 02.08.1993 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.1993 | Refusal of application | published on 22.09.1993 [1993/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION General Motors Building 3044 West Grand Boulevard Detroit Michigan 48202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/09] | For all designated states GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION General Motors Building 3044 West Grand Boulevard Detroit Michigan 48202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matouka, Michael F. 54577 Coventry Utica, Michigan 48087 / US | 02 /
Hammersmith, Robert J. 53722 Buckingham Lane Rocherster, Michigan 48064 / US | [1991/09] | Representative(s) | Haines, Arthur Donald, et al Patent Section 1st Floor Gideon House 28 Chapel Street Luton Bedfordshire LU1 2SE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/09] | Haines, Arthur Donald, et al Patent Section 1st Floor Gideon House 28 Chapel Street Luton, Bedfordshire LU1 2SE / GB | Application number, filing date | 90308624.7 | 06.08.1990 | [1991/09] | Priority number, date | US19890398685 | 25.08.1989 Original published format: US 398685 | [1991/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0414403 | Date: | 27.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B60T8/42, F16D7/10 | [1991/09] | CPC: |
B60T13/00 (KR);
B60T8/4266 (EP,US);
B60T8/4863 (EP,US);
F16D7/021 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1991/09] | Title | German: | Druckzylinder | [1991/09] | English: | Pressure actuator | [1991/09] | French: | Actuateur entraîné par pression | [1991/09] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 05.04.1991 | Examination requested [1991/22] | 20.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 23.04.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1993/38] | 03.05.1993 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1993/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0292648 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]); | [Y]EP0167415 (ACCEL ACCESS ELECTRONIQUES [FR]); | [A]DE1965275 |