EP0413524 - Titanium-aluminium based lightweight, heat resisting material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.01.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.02.1996 [1996/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR COMPANY LIMITED No. 2, Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-city Kanagawa-prefecture / JP | For all designated states Daido Tokushuko Kabushiki Kaisha 11-18, Nishiki 1-chome Naka-ku Nagoya-city Aichi-prefecture / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/08] | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR COMPANY LIMITED No. 2, Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-city, Kanagawa-prefecture / JP | ||
For all designated states DAIDO TOKUSHUKO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 11-18, Nishiki 1-chome Naka-ku Nagoya-city Aichi-prefecture / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sayashi, Mamoru, c/o Nissan Motor Company Lim. No. 2 Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-city, Kanagawa-prefecture / JP | 02 /
Shimizu, Tetsuya No. 15-7, Aza-Ubakoyama, Kasadera-cho Minami-ku, Nagoya-city, Aichi-Pref. / JP | [1991/08] | Representative(s) | Jenkins, Peter David, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/08] | Jenkins, Peter David, et al PAGE WHITE & FARRER 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 90308817.7 | 10.08.1990 | [1991/08] | Priority number, date | JP19890213702 | 18.08.1989 Original published format: JP 21370289 | [1991/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0413524 | Date: | 20.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0413524 | Date: | 01.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C22C14/00 | [1991/08] | CPC: |
C22C14/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1991/08] | Title | German: | Hitzebeständiger, leichter Werkstoff auf Titan-Aluminiumbasis | [1991/08] | English: | Titanium-aluminium based lightweight, heat resisting material | [1991/08] | French: | Matériau léger résistant aux températures élevées, à base de titane-aluminium | [1991/08] | Examination procedure | 26.06.1991 | Examination requested [1991/34] | 22.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.04.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.09.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 01.12.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.12.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]EP0363598 (NIPPON KOKAN KK [JP]); | [A]US3203794 (JAFFEE ROBERT I, et al); | [A]GB782564 (REM CRU TITANIUM INC) |