EP0413534 - Thread detector assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.1995 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.10.1995 [1995/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states De La Rue SYSTEMS LIMITED 6 Agar Street London WC2N 4DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/45] | For all designated states DE LA RUE SYSTEMS LIMITED 6 Agar Street London WC2N 4DE / GB | ||
Former [1991/08] | For all designated states DE LA RUE SYSTEMS LIMITED De la Rue House 3/5 Burlington Gardens London W1A 1DL / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reeves, David Charles 27 Goodwood Close, Cowplain Portsmouth, Hampshire / GB | 02 /
Potter, Michael Chapel Cottage, Ramsdean Petersfield, Hampshire GU32 1RR / GB | [1991/08] | Representative(s) | Skone James, Robert Edmund, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/08] | Skone James, Robert Edmund, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 90308870.6 | 13.08.1990 | [1991/08] | Priority number, date | GB19890018699 | 16.08.1989 Original published format: GB 8918699 | [1991/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0413534 | Date: | 20.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0413534 | Date: | 12.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G07D7/00 | [1991/08] | CPC: |
G07D7/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, SE [1991/08] | Title | German: | Fadenerfassungsanordnung | [1991/08] | English: | Thread detector assembly | [1991/08] | French: | Montage de détection de filament | [1991/08] | Examination procedure | 09.08.1991 | Examination requested [1991/41] | 10.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.03.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US3362532 (RIDDLE JOHN B, et al); | [YD]GB2098768 (BANK OF ENGLAND THE GOVERNOR &) |