EP0419041 - Speed/position sensor based upon magnetoresistive effect [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.10.1993 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.12.1993 [1993/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Texas Instruments Incorporated 13500 North Central Expressway Dallas, Texas 75265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/13] | For all designated states TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INCORPORATED 13500 North Central Expressway Dallas Texas 75265 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawate, Keith W. 12 Virginia Avenue Attleboro Falls, MA 02763 / US | 02 /
Berthold, James P. 32 State Street, B12 Attleboro, MA 02703 / US | 03 /
Margolis, Robert M. 265 Upland Avenue Newton, MA 02161 / US | [1991/13] | Representative(s) | Abbott, David John, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/13] | Abbott, David John, et al Abel & Imray Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London, WC1V 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 90309097.5 | 20.08.1990 | [1991/13] | Priority number, date | US19890409220 | 19.09.1989 Original published format: US 409220 | [1991/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0419041 | Date: | 27.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G01P3/488, G01P15/12, G01D5/16, G01P1/00 | [1991/13] | CPC: |
G01D5/147 (EP,US);
G01P1/006 (EP,US);
G01P15/105 (US);
G01P3/488 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1991/13] | Title | German: | Geschwindigkeits-/Positions-Messaufnehmer mit magnetfeldabhängigen Widerständen | [1991/13] | English: | Speed/position sensor based upon magnetoresistive effect | [1991/13] | French: | Capteur de vitesse/position à effet magnétorésistif | [1991/13] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 24.09.1991 | Examination requested [1991/47] | 04.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/50] | 15.07.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1993 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0201682 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [X]US4833406 (FOSTER JOHNNY R [US]) |