EP0425079 - Fibre optic gyroscopes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 30.07.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.1993 | Refusal of application | published on 22.09.1993 [1993/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRITISH AEROSPACE PUBLIC LIMITED COMPANY Warwick House, P.O. Box 87, Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough Hants. GU14 6YU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/45] | For all designated states BRITISH AEROSPACE PUBLIC LIMITED COMPANY Warwick House, P.O. Box 87, Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough, Hants. GU14 6YU / GB | ||
Former [1991/18] | For all designated states BRITISH AEROSPACE PLC Warwick House, P.O. Box 87, Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough, Hants. GU14 6YU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Malvern, Alan, British Aerospace (Dynamics) Ltd. Clittaford Road Plymouth, Devon PL6 6DE / GB | [1991/18] | Representative(s) | Dowler, Edward Charles, et al British Aerospace plc Corporate Intellectual Property Department ParkEast, PO Box 87, Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough, Hants GU14 6YU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/18] | Dowler, Edward Charles, et al British Aerospace plc Corporate Intellectual Property Department ParkEast, PO Box 87, Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough, Hants GU14 6YU / GB | Application number, filing date | 90309164.3 | 21.08.1990 | [1991/18] | Priority number, date | GB19890023932 | 24.10.1989 Original published format: GB 8923932 | [1991/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0425079 | Date: | 02.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G01C19/72 | [1991/18] | CPC: |
G01C19/727 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1991/18] | Title | German: | Faserkreisel | [1991/18] | English: | Fibre optic gyroscopes | [1991/18] | French: | Gyroscope à fibre optique | [1991/18] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 01.09.1990 | Examination requested [1991/18] | 27.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1993/38] | 03.05.1993 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1993/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4013365 (VALI VICTOR, et al); | [X]US4533249 (WEBBER GEORGE E [US]); | [X]EP0248648 |