EP0437020 - Output optics detection system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 16.02.1996 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.1996 | Refusal of application | published on 03.04.1996 [1996/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Litton Systems, Inc. 360 North Crescent Drive Beverly Hills California 90210-9990 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/29] | For all designated states Litton Systems, Inc. 360 North Crescent Drive Beverly Hills California 90210-9990 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mitchell, Robert Anthony 21601 Erwin No. 240 Woodland Hills, CA 91367 / US | 02 /
Hall, David Barnett 5165 Finehill Avenue La Cresenta, CA 91214 / US | 03 /
Shafer. Kenneth W. 664 Briarcliff Road Thousand Oaks, CA 91360 / US | [1991/29] | Representative(s) | Godsill, John Kenneth, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/29] | Godsill, John Kenneth, et al Haseltine Lake & Co. Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 90309185.8 | 22.08.1990 | [1991/29] | Priority number, date | US19900464164 | 12.01.1990 Original published format: US 464164 | [1991/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0437020 | Date: | 17.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0437020 | Date: | 09.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/41] | Type: | A1 / A2 RE Reissue of A-publication | No.: | EP0437020 | Date: | 16.01.1992 | [1992/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G01C19/66 | [1991/29] | CPC: |
G01C19/667 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1991/29] | Title | German: | Optisches Ausgangssignaldetektionssystem | [1991/29] | English: | Output optics detection system | [1991/29] | French: | Système optique de détection d'un signal de sortie | [1991/29] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 11.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/15] | 23.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.03.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 26.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.04.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 06.11.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1996/14] | 16.11.1995 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1996/14] | Request for further processing for: | 26.05.1994 | Request for further processing filed | 26.05.1994 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.06.1994 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1995 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4123162 (SANDERS VIRGIL E); | [AD]US4415266 (MATTHEWS JAMES B [US], et al); | [AD]US4449824 (MATTHEWS JAMES B [US]); | [AD]WO8900326 (LITTON SYSTEMS INC [US]) |