EP0414529 - 7-Keto- and 7-Hydroxy-androsta-3,5-diene-3-carboxylic acid derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1991/09] | Substituted steroid derivatives | ||
[1995/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.1995 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.12.1995 [1995/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION One Franklin Plaza P.O. Box 7929 Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19103 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/40] | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION One Franklin Plaza P.O. Box 7929 Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19103 / US | ||
Former [1991/09] | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION One Franklin Plaza Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19103 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Metcalf, Brian Walter 520 Woodland Drive Radnor, Pennsylvania 19087 / US | 02 /
Holt, Dennis Alan 4450A Gebhart School Road Mohnton, Pennsylvania 19540 / US | 03 /
Levy, Mark Alan 115 Reveille Road Wayne, Pennsylvania 19087 / US | [1991/09] | Representative(s) | Giddings, Peter John, et al GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/09] | Giddings, Peter John, Dr., et al SmithKline Beecham plc Corporate Intellectual Property SB House Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9BD / GB | Application number, filing date | 90309220.3 | 22.08.1990 | [1991/09] | Priority number, date | US19890398192 | 24.08.1989 Original published format: US 398192 | [1991/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0414529 | Date: | 27.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0414529 | Date: | 24.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0414529 | Date: | 04.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C07J41/00, A61K31/56, C07J9/00, C07J7/00 | [1991/32] | CPC: |
C07J7/004 (EP,US);
C07J1/00 (KR);
A61P13/02 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07J13/005 (EP,US);
C07J13/007 (EP,US);
C07J3/005 (EP,US);
C07J31/006 (EP,US);
C07J41/0005 (EP,US);
C07J41/0066 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1991/09] | C07J41/00, C07J9/00, C07J7/00, A61K31/56 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/09] | Title | German: | 7-Keto- und 7-Hydroxy-androsta-3,5-dien-3-carbonsäure Derivate | [1995/01] | English: | 7-Keto- and 7-Hydroxy-androsta-3,5-diene-3-carboxylic acid derivatives | [1995/01] | French: | Dérivés de l'acide 7-céto- et 7-hydroxy-androsta-3,5-diène- 3-carboxylique | [1995/01] |
Former [1991/09] | Substituierte Steroid-Derivate | ||
Former [1991/09] | Substituted steroid derivatives | ||
Former [1991/09] | Dérivés de stéroides substitués | Examination procedure | 27.12.1991 | Examination requested [1992/09] | 16.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.05.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0289327 (SMITHKLINE BECKMAN CORP [US]) |