EP0415680 - Improved upper tie plate for boiling water nuclear reactor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.03.1995 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/10] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Elkins, Robert Bruce 686 Hathaway Court San Jose, California 95136 / US | 02 /
Matzner, Bruce 1920 Crestmont Drive San Jose, California 95124 / US | 03 /
Curulla, Michael Vincent 6009 Susan Court San Jose, California 95123 / US | [1991/10] | Representative(s) | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/19] | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | ||
Former [1991/10] | Smith, Thomas Ian Macdonald London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Burdett House 15-16 Buckingham Street London WC2N 6DU / GB | Application number, filing date | 90309349.0 | 24.08.1990 | [1991/10] | Priority number, date | US19890399107 | 28.08.1989 Original published format: US 399107 | [1991/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0415680 | Date: | 06.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0415680 | Date: | 11.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G21C3/324, G21C3/33 | [1991/10] | CPC: |
G21C3/324 (EP,US);
Y02E30/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, IT, LI, SE [1991/10] | Title | German: | Verbesserung der oberen Halteplatte für einen Siedewasserkernreaktor | [1991/10] | English: | Improved upper tie plate for boiling water nuclear reactor | [1991/10] | French: | Plaque de fixation supérieure améliorée, pour réacteurs nucléaires à eau bouillante | [1991/10] | Examination procedure | 13.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 09.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.11.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 11.05.1994 | IT | 11.05.1994 | [2006/14] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 11.05.1994 | |
FR | 07.10.1994 | ||
Former [1995/24] | FR | 07.10.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0182196 (ASEA ATOM AB [SE]); | [A]US4560532 (BARRY ROBERT F [US], et al); | [A]DE3619930 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]); | [APD]EP0336203 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) |