EP0419069 - System for selective laser assisted plating [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.05.1993 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.05.1993 | Change - withdrawal | published on 07.07.1993 [1993/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE WHITAKER CORPORATION 4550 New Linden Hill Road, Suite 450 Wilmington, Delaware 19808 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/14] | For all designated states THE WHITAKER CORPORATION 4550 New Linden Hill Road, Suite 450 Wilmington, Delaware 19808 / US | ||
Former [1991/13] | For all designated states AMP INCORPORATED 470 Friendship Road Harrisburg Pennsylvania 17105 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rowlette, John Robert 720 LaVale Drive Clemmons, N.C. 27012 / US | [1991/13] | Representative(s) | Warren, Keith Stanley, et al Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith, London W6 0LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/13] | Warren, Keith Stanley, et al BARON & WARREN 18 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 90309490.2 | 30.08.1990 | [1991/13] | Priority number, date | US19890411355 | 22.09.1989 Original published format: US 411355 | [1991/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0419069 | Date: | 27.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0419069 | Date: | 09.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C25D5/02, C23C18/16, G02B27/00 | [1992/37] | CPC: |
G02B27/144 (EP,US);
B23K26/067 (EP,US);
G02B27/106 (EP,US);
G02B27/1086 (EP,US);
G02B5/32 (EP,US);
Y10S359/90 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1991/13] | C25D5/02, C23C18/16 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [1991/13] | Title | German: | System zur selektiven lasergestützten Plattierung | [1991/13] | English: | System for selective laser assisted plating | [1991/13] | French: | Dispositif pour le dépôt sélectif assisté par rayons laser | [1991/13] | File destroyed: | 03.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 27.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/13] | 04.03.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP62263862 ; | [Y]US4832798 (CVIJANOVICH GEORGE B [US], et al) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 012, no. 142 (M-692)30 April 1988 & JP-A-62 263 862 ( TOSHIBA CORP. ) 16 November 1987, & JP62263862 A 19871116 |