EP0417963 - Toothbrush with voltage tester [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.1995 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.07.1995 [1995/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hukuba, Hiroshi No. 914-1, Nazukari Nagareyama-shi Chiba-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/12] | For all designated states Hukuba, Hiroshi No. 914-1, Nazukari Nagareyama-shi Chiba-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1991/12] | Representative(s) | Parry, Christopher Stephen, et al PAGE, WHITE & FARRER 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/12] | Parry, Christopher Stephen, et al PAGE, WHITE & FARRER 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 90309696.4 | 05.09.1990 | [1991/12] | Priority number, date | JP19890236491 | 12.09.1989 Original published format: JP 23649189 | [1991/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0417963 | Date: | 20.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0417963 | Date: | 18.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0417963 | Date: | 03.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A46B15/00 | [1991/12] | CPC: |
A46B15/0004 (EP,US);
A46B15/00 (KR);
A46B15/0002 (EP,US);
A46B15/0022 (EP,US);
A46B15/0036 (EP,US);
A61N1/26 (EP,US);
A46B2200/1066 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/12] | Title | German: | Zahnbürste mit Spannungsprüfer | [1991/12] | English: | Toothbrush with voltage tester | [1991/12] | French: | Brosse à dents avec vérificateur de tension | [1991/12] | Examination procedure | 29.10.1991 | Examination requested [1991/52] | 20.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.02.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.05.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4726806 (HUKUBA HIROSHI [JP]); | [AD]EP0207678 (HUKUBA HIROSHI); | [A]CH466215 (GEORGE G SIMOR [US]) |