EP0416889 - Frequency mixers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.09.1992 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.11.1992 [1992/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LSI LOGIC EUROPE PLC Grenville Place, The Ring Bracknell, Berkshire RG12 1BP / GB | [1991/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Atkinson, Simon 36 Rectory Lane North Leybourne, Kent ME19 5RA / GB | [1991/11] | Representative(s) | Thomson, Roger Bruce, et al W.P. Thompson & Co. Eastcheap House Central Approach Letchworth Hertfordshire SG6 3DS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/11] | Thomson, Roger Bruce, et al W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Eastcheap House Central Approach Letchworth Hertfordshire SG6 3DS / GB | Application number, filing date | 90309701.2 | 05.09.1990 | [1991/11] | Priority number, date | GB19890020335 | 08.09.1989 Original published format: GB 8920335 | [1991/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0416889 | Date: | 13.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0416889 | Date: | 25.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H03D7/14 | [1991/11] | CPC: |
H03D7/1425 (EP);
H03D7/1433 (EP);
H03D7/1491 (EP);
H03D2200/0043 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1991/11] | Title | German: | Frequenzmischer | [1991/11] | English: | Frequency mixers | [1991/11] | French: | Mélangeur de fréquence | [1991/11] | File destroyed: | 16.02.2000 | Examination procedure | 26.03.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/47] | 23.06.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1992/47] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS5544222 ; | [A]JPS5765904 ; | [A]GB2073983 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP); | [X]US4510452 (ISHIDA KOHJI [JP], et al); | [A]EP0316999 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 004, no. 075 (E-013)May 31, 1980 & JP-A-55 44 222 (HITACHI ) March 281980 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 6, no. 144 (E-122)August 3, 1982 & JP-A-57 65 904 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD ) April 211982 | [A] - ELEKTOR vol. 3, no. 7, July 1977CANTERBURY GB page 38; 'HIGH-LEVEL MIXER ' |