blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0416924

EP0416924 - Method of producing conductive members on a semiconductor surface [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.04.1993
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip21.04.1993Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.06.1993 [1993/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GTE Laboratories Incorporated
1209 Orange Street Wilmington
Delaware 01901 / US
[N/P]
Former [1991/11]For all designated states
GTE LABORATORIES INCORPORATED
1209 Orange Street
Wilmington Delaware 01901 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Lockwood, Harry F.
21 White Oak Road
Waban, MA 02168 / US
02 / Tabasky, Marvin
11 Clinton Road
Peabody, MA 01960 / US
03 / Stern, Margaret B.
177 Plympton Road
Sudbury, MA 01776 / US
04 / Cataldo, Victor
12 Tomahawk Drive
Wilmington, MA 01887 / US
[1991/11]
Representative(s)Bubb, Antony John Allen, et al
Wilson Gunn Chancery House, Chancery Lane
London WC2A 1QU / GB
[N/P]
Former [1991/11]Bubb, Antony John Allen, et al
GEE & CO. Chancery House Chancery Lane
London WC2A 1QU / GB
Application number, filing date90309770.706.09.1990
[1991/11]
Priority number, dateUS1989040423707.09.1989         Original published format: US 404237
[1991/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0416924
Date:13.03.1991
Language:EN
[1991/11]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0416924
Date:11.03.1992
Language:EN
[1992/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.01.1992
ClassificationIPC:H01L21/285, C23C16/04, H01L29/40
[1992/11]
CPC:
H10D30/0614 (EP,US); H01L21/28575 (EP,US); H01L21/28581 (EP,US);
H10D30/0616 (EP,US)
Former IPC [1991/11]H01L21/285
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [1991/11]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Herstellen von leitenden Elementen auf einer Halbleiteroberfläche[1991/11]
English:Method of producing conductive members on a semiconductor surface[1991/11]
French:Procédé de fabrication de membres conducteurs sur une surface semi-conductrice[1991/11]
File destroyed:03.08.2001
Examination procedure12.09.1992Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1993/23]
14.01.1993Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [1993/23]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
22.10.1992M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.199203   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]JPS62114276  ;
 [X]JPH01117071  ;
 [X]DE2151127  ;
 [X]WO8607491  (NCR CO [US]);
 [X]WO8703741  (NCR CO [US]);
 [X]EP0240309  (CANON KK [JP])
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 325 (E-551) 22 October 1987& JP-A-62 114276 (OKI ELECTRIC IND. CO. LTD.) 26 May 1987,
 [X]  - APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS. vol. 54, no. 17, 24 April 1989NEW YORK US pages 1672 - 1674; R.V. JOSHI et al.: "Novel self-aligned W/TiN/TiSi2 contact structure for very shallow junctions and interconnections"
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 356 (E-803) 09 August 1989& JP-A-01 117071 (FUJITSU LTD.) 09 May 1989,
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.