EP0474929 - Laminar flow fans [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.03.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.05.1993 [1993/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/12] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wilkinson, Philip Robert Charles 165 North East Road, Sholing Southampton, Hampshire, SO2 8BA / GB | [1992/12] | Representative(s) | Bailey, Geoffrey Alan IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/12] | Bailey, Geoffrey Alan IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 90309938.0 | 11.09.1990 | [1992/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0474929 | Date: | 18.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F04D17/16 | [1992/12] | CPC: |
F04D17/161 (EP,US);
Y10T403/7005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/12] | Title | German: | Laminarströmungsgebläse | [1992/12] | English: | Laminar flow fans | [1992/12] | French: | Ventilateurs à flux laminaire | [1992/12] | File destroyed: | 28.09.2001 | Examination procedure | 19.09.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/20] | 22.12.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1993/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 23.10.1992 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2632598 (WALES JR NATHANIEL B); | [A]FR1280348 ; | [A]DE599519 (CARL HEINRICH DENCKER DR ING); | [A]US4255081 (OKLEJAS ROBERT A, et al); | [AD]GB2126653 (BRITISH GAS CORP) |