EP0418051 - Transparent polybutylene terephthalate resin film and processes for producing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 21.11.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.1995 | Refusal of application | published on 10.01.1996 [1996/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states POLYPLASTICS CO. LTD. 3-13, Azuchicho, 2-chome Chuo-Ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/12] | For all designated states POLYPLASTICS CO. LTD. 3-13, Azuchicho, 2-chome Chuo-Ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nedzu, Shigeru 990-7 Tenma Fuji-shi, Shizuoka / JP | [1991/12] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Peter, et al Barker Brettell 10-12 Priests Bridge London SW15 5JE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/12] | Jackson, Peter, et al HYDE, HEIDE & O'DONNELL 10-12 Priests Bridge London SW15 5JE / GB | Application number, filing date | 90309973.7 | 12.09.1990 | [1991/12] | Priority number, date | JP19890239613 | 14.09.1989 Original published format: JP 23961389 | [1991/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0418051 | Date: | 20.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0418051 | Date: | 10.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B29C47/00, C08J5/18, // B29K67/00 | [1991/12] | CPC: |
C08J5/18 (EP,KR,US);
B29C48/0017 (EP,KR,US);
B29C48/022 (EP,KR,US);
B29C48/10 (EP,KR,US);
C08L67/02 (KR);
B29K2067/00 (KR);
C08J2367/02 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/12] | Title | German: | Lichtdurchlässige Polybutylenterephthalatfolie und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1991/12] | English: | Transparent polybutylene terephthalate resin film and processes for producing the same | [1991/12] | French: | Film en polybutylène téréphtalate transparent et procédé pour sa fabrication | [1991/12] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 02.11.1992 | Examination requested [1993/01] | 24.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1996/02] | 26.08.1995 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1996/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP60245539 ; | [A]JP1172449 ; | [A]EP0106225 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [AD]EP0287246 (POLYPLASTICS CO [JP]); | [E]EP0407209 (POLYPLASTICS CO [JP]) | [A] - WORLD PATENTS INDEX LATEST Section Ch, Week 04, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class A, AN 86-024285 & JP-A-60 245 539 (IDEMITSU PETROCHEM.) 5 December 1985, & JP60245539 A 19851205 | [A] - WORLD PATENTS INDEX LATEST Section Ch, Week 33, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class A, AN 89-237790 & JP-A-1 172 449 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEM.) 7 July 1989, & JP1172449 A 19890707 |