EP0419162 - Method and apparatus for solidifying radioactive waste [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.11.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.11.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.12.1996 [1996/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/13] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kikuchi, Makato 2-1-1, Mikanohara-cho Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki-ken / JP | 02 /
Ohura, Masato 1-5-4-405, Nishinarusawa-cho Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki-ken / JP | 03 /
Tamata, Shin 2899-19, Isohama, Oarai-machi Higashiibaraki-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP | 04 /
Chino, Koichi 2-26-3, Nakanarusawa-cho Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki-ken / JP | 05 /
Funabashi, Kiyomi 2917-147, Mawatari Katsuta-shi, Ibaraki-ken / JP | [1991/13] | Representative(s) | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/06] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [1991/13] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward MEWBURN ELLIS 2 Cursitor Street London EC4A 1BQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 90310117.8 | 17.09.1990 | [1991/13] | Priority number, date | JP19890243671 | 20.09.1989 Original published format: JP 24367189 | [1991/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0419162 | Date: | 27.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0419162 | Date: | 02.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G21F9/16, G21F9/34 | [1992/01] | CPC: |
G21F9/14 (EP,US);
G21F9/008 (EP,US);
G21F9/302 (EP,US);
G21F9/304 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1991/13] | G21F9/34 | Designated contracting states | FR, GB [1991/13] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Verfestigung von radioaktiven Abfällen | [1991/13] | English: | Method and apparatus for solidifying radioactive waste | [1991/13] | French: | Procédé et appareil de solidification de déchets radioactifs | [1991/13] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 03.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/13] | 26.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.04.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/52] | 25.07.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/52] | Request for further processing for: | 17.07.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 17.07.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.08.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1996 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]WO8911149 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | [X]WO8404624 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | [A]FR2525803 (KERNFORSCHUNGSZ KARLSRUHE [DE]); | [A]US4173546 (HAYES JOHN F [US]); | [A]FR2525381 (KERNFORSCHUNGSZ KARLSRUHE [DE]) |