EP0419227 - Ball screw actuated clutch combination [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.01.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.01.1996 [1996/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Borg-Warner Automotive, Inc. 6700 18 1/2 Mile Road P.O. Box 8022 Sterling Heights MI 48311-8022 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/01] | For all designated states BORG-WARNER AUTOMOTIVE, INC. 6700 18 1/2 Mile Road, P.O. Box 8022 Sterling Heights, Michigan 48311-8022 / US | ||
Former [1991/13] | For all designated states BORG-WARNER AUTOMOTIVE, INC. 6700 18 1/2 Mile Road P.O.Box 8022 Sterling Heights, Michigan 48311-8022 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Carlton, Kenneth E. 5501 Keller Road Muncie, Indiana 47304 / US | [1991/13] | Representative(s) | Allden, Thomas Stanley, et al A.A. Thornton & CO. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/13] | Allden, Thomas Stanley, et al A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 90310230.9 | 19.09.1990 | [1991/13] | Priority number, date | US19890410561 | 21.09.1989 Original published format: US 410561 | [1991/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0419227 | Date: | 27.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0419227 | Date: | 31.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F16H63/30, F16D21/04, F16D13/04, F16D23/10 | [1991/13] | CPC: |
F16H3/14 (EP,US);
F16D23/00 (KR);
F16D13/04 (EP,US);
F16D21/04 (EP,US);
F16D41/22 (EP,US);
Y10T74/19488 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1991/13] | Title | German: | Mit Kugelschraube betätigte Kupplungseinheit | [1991/13] | English: | Ball screw actuated clutch combination | [1991/13] | French: | Embrayage activé par vis a bille | [1991/13] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 16.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/37] | 17.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/04] | 29.08.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1995 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2170870 (GREEN PAUL CLIFFORD); | [Y]FR2546998 (YANMAR DIESEL ENGINE CO [JP]); | [AD]US4287973 (EICHINGER JOHANN, et al); | [A]DE202731 ; | [A]EP0270747 (HURTH MASCH ZAHNRAD CARL [DE]); | [A]US3135129 (MERRITT HENRY E) |