EP0419290 - Developing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1991/13] | Toner cartridge | ||
[1994/09] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.02.1995 [1995/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITA INDUSTRIAL CO. LTD. 2-28, Tamatsukuri 1-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 540 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/13] | For all designated states MITA INDUSTRIAL CO. LTD. 2-28, Tamatsukuri 1-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 540 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Komaki, Susumu 7-24-511 Houraku-cho Nishinomiya-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | [1991/13] | Representative(s) | Senior, Alan Murray, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/09] | Senior, Alan Murray, et al J.A. KEMP & CO., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | ||
Former [1991/13] | Williams, Trevor John J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 90310393.5 | 21.09.1990 | [1991/13] | Priority number, date | JP19890244969 | 22.09.1989 Original published format: JP 24496989 | [1991/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0419290 | Date: | 27.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0419290 | Date: | 25.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0419290 | Date: | 02.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/08 | [1991/13] | CPC: |
G03G15/0882 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1991/13] | Title | German: | Entwicklungsvorrichtung | [1994/09] | English: | Developing device | [1994/09] | French: | Appareil pour développement | [1994/09] |
Former [1991/13] | Tonerbehälter | ||
Former [1991/13] | Toner cartridge | ||
Former [1991/13] | Récipient de toneur | Examination procedure | 28.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/13] | 03.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.08.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP55090979 ; | [A]JP60102665 ; | [X]JPS63187272 (TOKYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 4, no. 142 (P-30)[624], 7th October 1980; & JP-A-55 090 979 (RICOH K.K.) 10-07-1980, & JP55090979 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 253 (P-395)[1976], 11th October 1985; & JP-A-60 102 665 (FUJI XEROX K.K.) 06-06-1985, & JP60102665 A 00000000 |