EP0421653 - Technique for compensating switched capacitor circuits having gain-setting resistors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.09.1993 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.11.1993 [1993/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [1991/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Scott, Jeffrey William 602 Las Vegas Drive Temple, Pennsylvania 19560 / US | 02 /
Viswanathan, Thayamkulangara Ramaswany 110 Gail Circle Wyomissing, Pennsylvania 19610 / US | [1991/15] | Representative(s) | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 0TU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/15] | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al AT&T (UK) LTD., AT&T Intellectual Property Division, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 90310466.9 | 25.09.1990 | [1991/15] | Priority number, date | US19890416888 | 04.10.1989 Original published format: US 416888 | [1991/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0421653 | Date: | 10.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0421653 | Date: | 16.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H03M1/06 | [1992/38] | CPC: |
H03M1/0604 (EP,US);
H03M1/804 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1991/15] | H03M1/86 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [1991/15] | Title | German: | Technik zur Kompensation von Schaltungen mit geschalteten Kapazitäten, welche Widerstände zur Einstellung des Verstärkungsfaktors haben | [1991/15] | English: | Technique for compensating switched capacitor circuits having gain-setting resistors | [1991/15] | French: | Technique pour la compensation de circuits à capacités commutés ayant des résistances d'établissement de gain | [1991/15] | File destroyed: | 23.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 17.03.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/46] | 21.06.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1993/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 22.04.1993 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3469255 (HOFFMAN PHILIP A, et al); | [A]EP0252321 (TEKTRONIX INC [US]) |