Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
17.06.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.08.1993 [1993/31] |
09.04.1992 | Publication of search report | published on 27.05.1992 [1992/22] |
16.02.1991 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 03.04.1991 [1991/14] |