EP0420704 - Control system for turbocharger with rotary electric machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.1995 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.05.1995 [1995/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Isuzu Motors Limited 26-1 Minami-ohi 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-8524 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/14] | For all designated states Isuzu Motors Limited 6-22-10 Minamiooi Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Muraji, Hiroshi 28-5, Nishigaoka 1-chome, Izumi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [1991/14] | Representative(s) | Brunner, Michael John, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/14] | Brunner, Michael John, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 90310731.6 | 01.10.1990 | [1991/14] | Priority number, date | JP19890254499 | 29.09.1989 Original published format: JP 25449989 | [1991/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0420704 | Date: | 03.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0420704 | Date: | 01.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.12.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F02B37/14 | [1991/14] | CPC: |
F02B37/10 (EP,US);
F02B37/14 (EP,US);
F02B39/10 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1991/14] | Title | German: | Steuersystem für Turbolader mit elektrischer Drehmaschine | [1991/14] | English: | Control system for turbocharger with rotary electric machine | [1991/14] | French: | Système de commande pour turbocompresseur comprenant une machine électrique rotative | [1991/14] | Examination procedure | 27.09.1991 | Examination requested [1991/48] | 04.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.12.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0079100 (MICROTURBO S A [FR]); | [A]EP0311457 (ISUZU MOTORS LTD [JP]) |