EP0421757 - Microwave antenna [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.12.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.02.1995 [1995/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEC-MARCONI LIMITED The Grove, Warren Lane Stanmore Middlesex HA7 4LY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/15] | For all designated states GEC-MARCONI LIMITED The Grove, Warren Lane Stanmore, Middlesex HA7 4LY / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jairam, Hari 12 Thomson Road Harrow, Middlesex HA3 7NA / GB | [1991/15] | Representative(s) | Keppler, William Patrick The General Electric Company, p.l.c. GEC Patent Department Waterhouse Lane Chelmsford, Essex CM1 2QX / GB | [1991/15] | Application number, filing date | 90310821.5 | 03.10.1990 | [1991/15] | Priority number, date | GB19890022377 | 04.10.1989 Original published format: GB 8922377 | [1991/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0421757 | Date: | 10.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0421757 | Date: | 21.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q13/02 | [1991/15] | CPC: |
H01Q13/065 (EP);
H01Q13/0241 (EP);
H01Q13/0266 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1991/15] | Title | German: | Mikrowellenantenne | [1991/15] | English: | Microwave antenna | [1991/15] | French: | Antenne à micro-ondes | [1991/15] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 13.05.1992 | Examination requested [1992/28] | 14.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/07] | 21.09.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1994 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP5424561 ; | [A]US3434146 ; | [A]US3553707 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 3, no. 47 (E-105), 20th April 1979; & JP-A-54 24 561 (OKI DENKI KOGYO K.K.) 23-02-1979, & JP5424561 A 00000000 | [A] - ELECTRONICS LETTERS, vol. 9, no. 25, 13th December 1973, pages 596-597; J. COWAN: "Dual-band reflector-feed element for frequency-reuse applications" | [A] - ELECTRONICS LETTERS, vol. 17, no. 21, October 1981, pages 777-779; W. DAVIES et al.: "Bird-proof feed-horn windows for microwave radio systems antennas" |