EP0422906 - Electrodes on a mounting substrate and a liquid crystal display apparatus including same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.12.1995 [1995/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 545-0013 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/16] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoshida, Hirokazu 1-3-2-1008, Nishi-Suminoe, Suminoe-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | [1991/16] | Representative(s) | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/16] | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 90311071.6 | 09.10.1990 | [1991/16] | Priority number, date | JP19890263478 | 09.10.1989 Original published format: JP 26347889 | [1991/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0422906 | Date: | 17.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0422906 | Date: | 14.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/60, G02F1/13, G02F1/1345 | [1991/16] | CPC: |
G02F1/13452 (EP,US);
H01L21/563 (EP,US);
H01L24/81 (EP,US);
H01L2224/16 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73203 (EP,US);
H01L2224/81801 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01006 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01013 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01029 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01033 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01042 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01047 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01049 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0105 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01073 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01074 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01075 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/12033, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1991/16] | Title | German: | Elektroden auf einem Montagesubstrat und Flüssigkristallanzeigevorrichtung, die dieses enthält | [1991/16] | English: | Electrodes on a mounting substrate and a liquid crystal display apparatus including same | [1991/16] | French: | Electrodes sur un substrat de montage et dispositif d'affichage à cristal liquide qui le comprend | [1991/16] | Examination procedure | 28.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/16] | 14.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.05.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP61295639 ; | [A]JP62299819 ; | [A]JP01063929 ; | [A]FR2492164 (RADIOTECHNIQUE COMPELEC [FR]); | [X]US4772820 (DISANTO FRANK J [US], et al); | [Y]EP0303256 (SHINETSU POLYMER CO [JP], et al); | [X]US4853296 (FUKUYOSHI KENZO [JP]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 11, no. 161 (E-509)[2608], 23rd May 1987; & JP-A-61 295 639 (FUJITSU LTD) 26-12-1986, & JP61295639 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 12, no. 194 (P-713)[3041], 7th June 1988; & JP-A-62 299 819 (MATSUSHITA) 26-12-1987, & JP62299819 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 13, no. 271 (P-889), 22nd June 1989; & JP-A-01 063 929 (TOSHIBA) 09-03-1989, & JP01063929 A 00000000 |