EP0451401 - Improved cleaning apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.10.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Williams, William Hendrick 4938 Golden Arrow Drive Rancho Palos Verdes California 90274 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/38] | For all designated states Williams, William Hendrick 4938 Golden Arrow Drive Rancho Palos Verdes, California 90274 / US | ||
Former [1991/42] | For all designated states Williams, William Hendrick 4938 Golden Arrow Drive Rancho Palos Verdes, California 90274 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1991/42] | Representative(s) | Senior, Alan Murray, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/09] | Senior, Alan Murray, et al J.A. KEMP & CO., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | ||
Former [1991/42] | Williams, Trevor John J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 90311232.4 | 12.10.1990 | [1991/42] | Priority number, date | US19900507641 | 11.04.1990 Original published format: US 507641 | [1991/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0451401 | Date: | 16.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0451401 | Date: | 22.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A47L9/04 | [1991/42] | CPC: |
A47L9/0411 (EP,US);
A47L9/0444 (EP,US);
A47L9/0494 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/42] | Title | German: | Reinigungsgerät | [1991/42] | English: | Improved cleaning apparatus | [1991/42] | French: | Appareil de nettoyage | [1991/42] | Examination procedure | 24.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/13] | 29.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.06.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.12.1993 | BE | 22.12.1993 | DK | 22.12.1993 | ES | 22.12.1993 | GR | 22.12.1993 | IT | 22.12.1993 | NL | 22.12.1993 | SE | 22.12.1993 | [2008/01] |
Former [2002/24] | AT | 22.12.1993 | |
BE | 22.12.1993 | ||
DK | 22.12.1993 | ||
ES | 22.12.1993 | ||
GR | 22.12.1993 | ||
IT | 22.12.1993 | ||
NL | 22.12.1993 | ||
SE | 22.12.1993 | ||
Former [2000/04] | AT | 22.12.1993 | |
BE | 22.12.1993 | ||
DK | 22.12.1993 | ||
GR | 22.12.1993 | ||
IT | 22.12.1993 | ||
NL | 22.12.1993 | ||
SE | 22.12.1993 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 22.12.1993 | |
BE | 22.12.1993 | ||
DK | 22.12.1993 | ||
IT | 22.12.1993 | ||
NL | 22.12.1993 | ||
SE | 22.12.1993 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 22.12.1993 | |
BE | 22.12.1993 | ||
DK | 22.12.1993 | ||
NL | 22.12.1993 | ||
SE | 22.12.1993 | ||
Former [1994/48] | AT | 22.12.1993 | |
BE | 22.12.1993 | ||
NL | 22.12.1993 | ||
SE | 22.12.1993 | ||
Former [1994/46] | AT | 22.12.1993 | |
NL | 22.12.1993 | ||
SE | 22.12.1993 | ||
Former [1994/43] | NL | 22.12.1993 | |
SE | 22.12.1993 | ||
Former [1994/39] | NL | 22.12.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2336710 (WIED JULIUS P); | [A]DE1285125 (ELECTROLUX AB); | [AD]US3605172 (DAMASCO LOUIS J); | [AD]US3802026 (CRENER B); | [A]GB2095540 (BLACK & DECKER INC) |