EP0424061 - Forming long arrays from short components [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.1996 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.08.1996 [1996/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square Rochester New York 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/17] | For all designated states XEROX CORPORATION Xerox Square Rochester New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Campanelli, Michael R. 1105 Marigold Drive Webster, New York 14580 / US | 02 /
Drake, Donald J. 480 French Road Rochester, New York 14618 / US | [1991/17] | Representative(s) | Reynolds, Julian David, et al Xerox Limited Patents Department Xerox Technical Centre Bessemer Road Welwyn Garden City Herts AL7 1HE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/35] | Reynolds, Julian David, et al Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | ||
Former [1991/17] | Weatherald, Keith Baynes Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | Application number, filing date | 90311249.8 | 15.10.1990 | [1991/17] | Priority number, date | US19890422220 | 16.10.1989 Original published format: US 422220 | [1991/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0424061 | Date: | 24.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0424061 | Date: | 27.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0424061 | Date: | 30.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H01L25/04, H01L25/065, H04N1/028 | [1991/17] | CPC: |
B41J2/155 (EP,US);
H01L24/75 (EP,US);
H01L24/83 (EP,US);
H04N1/03 (EP,US);
B41J2002/14362 (EP,US);
B41J2202/20 (EP,US);
H01L2224/8319 (EP,US);
H01L2224/83224 (EP,US);
H01L2224/8385 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01005 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01006 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01013 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01027 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01033 (EP,US);
H01L2924/07802 (EP,US);
H01L2924/10253 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12042 (EP,US);
H04N2201/02456 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0247 (EP,US);
H04N2201/02487 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1089 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/10253, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12042, H01L2924/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/17] | Title | German: | Herstellungsverfahren von langen Matrizen aus kurzen Bauelementen | [1991/17] | English: | Forming long arrays from short components | [1991/17] | French: | Procédé pour former de longues matrices à partir de composants courts | [1991/17] | Examination procedure | 29.04.1992 | Examination requested [1992/26] | 15.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.02.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0201396 (THOMSON CSF [FR]); | [A]EP0115946 (XEROX CORP [US]); | [AD]US4467342 (TOWER JOHN R [US]); | [AD]US4698113 (OGAWA KAZUFUMI [JP]); | [A]EP0329004 (TAIYO YUDEN KK [JP]) | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN. vol. 26, no. 4, September 4, 1983, NEW YORK US pages 1905 - 1906; M.D.RIES ET AL.: 'led substrate fabrication ' | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN. vol. 15, no. 9, February 9, 1973, NEW YORK US pages 2971 - 2972; D.E.HOUSER: 'component positioning device ' |