EP0427406 - Improvements relating to blood sampling devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.1996 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.03.1996 [1996/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OWEN MUMFORD LTD. Brook Hill Woodstock Oxford OX7 1TU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/20] | For all designated states OWEN MUMFORD LTD. Brook Hill Woodstock Oxford OX7 1TU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marshall, James M. J. 16 Cranham Street Jericho, Oxford / GB | 02 /
Crossman, David D. 86 Hill Road Watlington, Oxford / GB | [1991/20] | Representative(s) | Lainé, Simon James, et al Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James 22, Rodney Road Cheltenham Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/20] | Lainé, Simon James, et al Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James 22, Rodney Road Cheltenham Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 90311282.9 | 16.10.1990 | [1991/20] | Priority number, date | GB19890024937 | 04.11.1989 Original published format: GB 8924937 | [1991/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0427406 | Date: | 15.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0427406 | Date: | 05.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/14 | [1991/20] | CPC: |
A61B5/15117 (EP,US);
A61B5/150022 (EP,US);
A61B5/150412 (EP,US);
A61B5/150549 (EP,US);
A61B5/150618 (EP,US);
A61B5/150717 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1991/20] | Title | German: | Verbesserungen für Blutentnahmegeräte | [1991/20] | English: | Improvements relating to blood sampling devices | [1991/20] | French: | Amélioration pour instruments de prélèvement du sang | [1991/20] | Examination procedure | 15.11.1991 | Examination requested [1992/03] | 17.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 03.01.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0061102 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]); | [Y]US4375815 (BURNS JAMES A); | [A]EP0115388 (GENETICS INT INC [US]); | [A]FR2595237 (SALAUN CHRISTIAN [FR]) |