EP0425169 - Electrical energy storage system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.09.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.10.1992 [1992/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEC ALSTHOM LIMITED Mill Road Rugby Warwickshire CV21 1TB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/18] | For all designated states GEC ALSTHOM LIMITED Mill Road Rugby Warwickshire CV21 1TB / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Davenport, John Layton 28 Strines Road Marple, Stockport, SK6 7BT / GB | [1991/18] | Representative(s) | Kirby, Harold Victor Albert The General Electric Company, p.l.c. GEC Patent Department Waterhouse Lane Chelmsford, Essex CM1 2QX / GB | [1991/18] | Application number, filing date | 90311355.3 | 17.10.1990 | [1991/18] | Priority number, date | GB19890024238 | 27.10.1989 Original published format: GB 8924238 | [1991/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0425169 | Date: | 02.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0425169 | Date: | 28.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H01F7/18 | [1991/18] | CPC: |
H01H47/043 (EP,US);
H01F7/18 (EP,US);
H02H1/06 (EP,US);
H02H3/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1991/18] | Title | German: | System zur Speicherung von elektrischer Energie | [1991/18] | English: | Electrical energy storage system | [1991/18] | French: | Système pour le stockage d'énergie électrique | [1991/18] | File destroyed: | 16.02.2000 | Examination procedure | 29.02.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/44] | 04.06.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1992/44] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2622368 (SERD SOC ET REALISA DISJONCT [FR]); | [Y]US4823074 (MCLYMAN COLONEL W T [US]); | [A]US3675040 (STAMPFLI HARALD); | [A]US4679766 (CUMING KENNETH J [AU]); | [A]DE2123948 ; | [A]FR2494027 (SODICRA [FR]) |