EP0425305 - Radiation curable cladding compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.1995 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.12.1995 [1995/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/18] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krepski, Larry R., c/o Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Co., 2501 Hudson Road, PO. Box 33427 St. Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
Rasmussen, Jerald K., c/o Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Co., 2501 Hudson Road, PO. Box 33427 St. Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
Babirad, Stefan A., c/o Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Co., 2501 Hudson Road, PO. Box 33427 St. Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
Heilmann, Steven M., c/o Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Co., 2501 Hudson Road, PO. Box 33427 St. Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [1991/18] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/18] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90311761.2 | 26.10.1990 | [1991/18] | Priority number, date | US19890427829 | 26.10.1989 Original published format: US 427829 | [1991/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0425305 | Date: | 02.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0425305 | Date: | 09.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0425305 | Date: | 28.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C09D4/02, G02B1/04 | [1991/18] | CPC: |
G02B6/02033 (EP,US);
C08L33/26 (KR);
G02B1/048 (EP,US);
B29K2033/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
G02B1/048, C08L33/16 (EP,US);
G02B1/048, C08L33/24 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1991/18] | Title | German: | Strahlungshärtbare Beschichtungszusammensetzung | [1991/18] | English: | Radiation curable cladding compositions | [1991/18] | French: | Composition de revêtement durcissable par radiation | [1991/18] | Examination procedure | 20.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/18] | 26.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.06.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3696081 (DOMBA ELEMER, et al); | [A]EP0193370 (AUSIMONT SPA [IT]); | [AD]EP0257863 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO [JP]); | [Y]EP0341825 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]); | [XP]EP0367583 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) |