EP0426471 - Municipal waste thermal oxidation system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.1994 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.01.1995 [1995/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ENTECH, INC. Suite 11, 5333 Fairbanks Street Anchorage Alaska 99518 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/19] | For all designated states ENTECH, INC. Suite 11, 5333 Fairbanks Street Anchorage, Alaska 99518 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pope, G. Michael 5950 Liberty Court Wasilla, Alaska 99687 / US | 02 /
Kerr, Donald F. 801 Terrace Drive Burlington, Iowa 52601 / US | [1991/19] | Representative(s) | Dealtry, Brian Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/19] | Dealtry, Brian Eric Potter & Clarkson St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham NG1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 90311971.7 | 01.11.1990 | [1991/19] | Priority number, date | US19890430371 | 02.11.1989 Original published format: US 430371 | [1991/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0426471 | Date: | 08.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0426471 | Date: | 09.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0426471 | Date: | 19.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F23G5/16, F23J1/00 | [1991/19] | CPC: |
F23G5/16 (EP,US);
F23J1/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/19] | Title | German: | Anlage zur thermischen Oxydation von Stadtmüll | [1991/19] | English: | Municipal waste thermal oxidation system | [1991/19] | French: | Système pour l'oxydation thermique des déchets municipaux | [1991/19] | Examination procedure | 31.05.1991 | Examination requested [1991/31] | 01.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.05.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.10.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB479962 (GUNNAR FRENGER); | [A]CH430018 (ALTHOFF DIETRICH DIPL ING [DE]); | [A]US3670667 (FAURHOLDT BENT); | [Y]US3749031 (BURDEN R); | [A]DE2549076 (KRAFTANLAGEN AG); | [A]DE2828555 (SIE SOC IMPIANTI ECOLOG); | [X]US4280878 (SPRENGER GERALD E); | [Y]US4398475 (MCKIEL JR CHARLES W [US]); | [Y]US4483832 (SCHIRMER ROBERT M [US]); | [A]EP0173628 (HURET CHRISTIAN GERARD); | [A]WO8700605 (GUERIN ALAIN [FR]); | [A]DE8520721U ; | [Y]US4800824 (DIFONZO MARK A [US]); | [A]EP0338183 (HOWORKA FRANZ [AT]) |