EP0426481 - Polyester resin exhibiting anisotropy in a molten state and resin composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.02.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.04.1993 [1993/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states POLYPLASTICS CO. LTD. 3-13, Azuchicho, 2-chome Chuo-Ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/19] | For all designated states POLYPLASTICS CO. LTD. 3-13, Azuchicho, 2-chome Chuo-Ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hayashi, Noriyuki 52 Morishita Fuji-shi, Shizuoka / JP | 02 /
Kageyama, Yukihiko 815 Gendojicho Fujinomiya-shi, Shizuoka / JP | 03 /
Hijikata, Kenji 8-8, Fujimidai Mishima-shi, Shizuoka / JP | [1991/19] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Peter, et al Barker Brettell 10-12 Priests Bridge London SW15 5JE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/19] | Jackson, Peter, et al HYDE, HEIDE & O'DONNELL 10-12 Priests Bridge London SW15 5JE / GB | Application number, filing date | 90312007.9 | 01.11.1990 | [1991/19] | Priority number, date | JP19890285631 | 01.11.1989 Original published format: JP 28563189 | [1991/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0426481 | Date: | 08.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0426481 | Date: | 12.02.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C08G63/60, C08L67/00 | [1991/19] | CPC: |
C08G63/605 (EP,US);
C08G63/60 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/19] | Title | German: | Im geschmolzenen Zustand Anisotropie zeigender Polyesterharz und daraus hergestellte Zusammensetzung | [1991/19] | English: | Polyester resin exhibiting anisotropy in a molten state and resin composition | [1991/19] | French: | Résine de polyester montrant une anisotropie à l'état fondu et sa composition | [1991/19] | File destroyed: | 28.09.2001 | Examination procedure | 13.08.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/14] | 12.11.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1993/14] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 16.09.1992 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1992 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0259670 (BASF AG [DE]); | [X]EP0022344 (CELANESE CORP [US]); | [A]WO8905323 (TOYO BOSEKI [JP]); | [A]EP0088742 (MONSANTO CO [US]); | [A]FR2339636 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]); | [A]EP0335816 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) |