EP0431774 - Scanner with slow scan image context procesing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.01.1997 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.02.1997 [1997/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square Rochester New York 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/24] | For all designated states XEROX CORPORATION Xerox Square Rochester New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Norder, Paul D. 75 Carverdale Drive Rochester, New York, 14618 / US | 02 /
Tandon, Jagdish C. 43 Kirby Trail Fairport, New York, 14450 / US | 03 /
Lin, Ying Wei 119 Hillrise Drive Penfield, New York, 14526 / US | 04 /
Calarco, Anthony F. 3 Whitney Farms Circle Fairport, New York, 14450 / US | [1991/24] | Representative(s) | Goode, Ian Roy, et al Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/24] | Goode, Ian Roy, et al Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | Application number, filing date | 90312454.3 | 15.11.1990 | [1991/24] | Priority number, date | US19890437730 | 17.11.1989 Original published format: US 437730 | [1991/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0431774 | Date: | 12.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0431774 | Date: | 19.02.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0431774 | Date: | 06.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.12.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/04 | [1996/10] | CPC: |
H04N1/1911 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0414 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0468 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1991/24] | H04N1/18 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/24] | Title | German: | Abtaster mit Bildkontextverarbeitung bei langsamer Abtastung | [1991/24] | English: | Scanner with slow scan image context procesing | [1991/24] | French: | Dispositif d'analyse avec traitement du contexte d'images analysées lentement | [1991/24] | Examination procedure | 05.08.1992 | Examination requested [1992/40] | 23.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.08.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3610271 (TOSHIBA KAWASAKI KK [JP]); | [A]US4319283 (OZAWA TAKASHI, et al); | [A]EP0046118 (MATRA [FR]) |