EP0435443 - Use of 15-keto-prostaglandin compound for improvement of encephalic function [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.1997 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.08.1997 [1997/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states R-TECH UENO LTD. 4-8, 2-chome, Koraibashi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/09] | For all designated states R-TECH UENO, LTD. 4-8, 2-chome, Koraibashi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | ||
Former [1991/27] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Ueno Seiyaku Oyo Kenkyujo 4-8, 2-chome, Koraibashi Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ueno, Ryuji 7-29, Misaku-cho Nishinomiya-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 02 /
Osama, Hiroyoshi No. B-104, Shikou-ryo, No. 29, Suzukakedai 1-chome Sanda-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 03 /
Oda, Tomio No. B-203, Shikou-ryo, No. 29, Suzukakedai 1-chome Sanda-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | [1991/27] | Representative(s) | Atkinson, Peter Birch, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester M1 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/32] | Atkinson, Peter Birch, et al MARKS & CLERK, Sussex House, 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | ||
Former [1991/27] | Atkinson, Peter Birch Marks & Clerk Suite 301 Sunlight House Quay Street Manchester M3 3JY / GB | Application number, filing date | 90312642.3 | 21.11.1990 | [1991/27] | Priority number, date | JP19890303839 | 22.11.1989 Original published format: JP 30383989 | JP19900007611 | 17.01.1990 Original published format: JP 761190 | JP19900085439 | 30.03.1990 Original published format: JP 8543990 | [1991/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0435443 | Date: | 03.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0435443 | Date: | 27.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0435443 | Date: | 28.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/557, C07C405/00 | [1996/35] | CPC: |
C07C405/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/557 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [1991/27] | A61K31/557 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/27] | Title | German: | Verwendung von 15-keto-Prostaglandin zur Verbesserung der encephalischen Funktion | [1991/27] | English: | Use of 15-keto-prostaglandin compound for improvement of encephalic function | [1991/27] | French: | Utilisation d'un composé 15-céto-prostaglandine pour améliorer la fonction encéphalique | [1991/27] | Examination procedure | 27.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/27] | 25.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 31.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.01.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.05.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JP62198616 [ ]; | [X]EP0153858 (UPJOHN CO [US], et al) | [ ] - DIALOG INFORM. SYSTEM & FILE 399, no. 99151639; Y.K. FUNG et al.: "An in vivo method for testing drugs that influence striatal dopaminergic functions", & PHARMACOL., BIOCHEM. BEHAV. 19(2), P231-4, 1983 | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 12, no. 50 (C-476)[2897], 16th February 1988, & JP-A-62 198 616 (RES. DEV. CORP. OF JAPAN) 02-09-1987, & JP62198616 A 00000000 | [ ] - STN FILE SERVER & FILE CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 85, no. 7, 1976, abstract no. 44276d, Columbus, Ohio, US; C.R. PACE-ASCIAK et al.: "Prostaglandins during development. V. Prostaglandin biosynthesis and catabolism in the developing fetal sheep brain", & J. BIOL. CHEM., 251(11), 3381-5 | [ ] - STN FILE SERVER & FILE CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 93, no. 15, 1980, abstract no. 147614g, Columbus, Ohio, US; R.J. GAUDET et al.: "Accumulation of cyclooxygenase products of arachidonic acid metabolism in gerbil brain during reperfusion after bilateral common carotid artery occlusion", & J. NEUROCHEM., 35(3), 653-8 | [ ] - STN FILE SERVER & FILE MEDLINE, accession no. 88046328, London, GB; A.A. MATHE et al.: "Metabolic products of arachidonic acid in the central nervous system: possible role in mental disorders", & ADV PRODTAGLANDIN THROMBOXANE LEUKOTRIENE RES, (1987) 17B 958-62 | Examination | - DIALOG INFORMATION SERVICES, File Embase no. 87102509 |