EP0430664 - Valve assembley [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 08.05.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.1998 | Opposition rejected | published on 24.06.1998 [1998/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FORT VALE ENGINEERING LIMITED Parkfield Works, Brunswick Street Nelson Lancashire BB9 0SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/23] | For all designated states FORT VALE ENGINEERING LIMITED Parkfield Works, Brunswick Street Nelson, Lancashire BB9 0SG / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fort, Edward Sagar "Ashcroft", Crow Trees Brow Chatburn, Nr. Clitheroe, Lancashire / GB | 02 /
Davenport, Stephen Hayden, Robert Laithe Farm Cottage, School Lane, Laneshawbridge Near Colne, Lancashire, BB8 7EQ / GB | [1991/23] | Representative(s) | WP Thompson 8th Floor 1 Mann Island Liverpool L3 1BP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/23] | W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building, Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | Application number, filing date | 90312931.0 | 28.11.1990 | [1991/23] | Priority number, date | GB19890027059 | 30.11.1989 Original published format: GB 8927059 | [1991/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0430664 | Date: | 05.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0430664 | Date: | 10.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F16K1/20, B65D90/62, F16K27/07 | [1991/23] | CPC: |
B65D90/623 (EP,US);
F16K1/2007 (EP,US);
F16K27/07 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1991/23] | Title | German: | Ventilanordnung | [1991/23] | English: | Valve assembley | [1991/23] | French: | Dispositif de soupape | [1991/23] | Examination procedure | 03.12.1991 | Examination requested [1992/05] | 16.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 29.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 08.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 13.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
06.07.1996
24.07.1996
ADMISSIBLE GESTRA Aktiengesellschaft Hemmstrasse 130 D-28215 Bremen / DE Opponent's representative Brügge, Jürgen, et al, et al Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [1996/36] | 18.07.1996 | No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 24.07.1996 | No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 14.11.1996 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 04.04.1997 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 08.12.1997 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1998/26] | 08.12.1997 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.01.1998 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 27.01.1998 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1992 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.01.1993 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1423403 (ELECTROLUX AB); | [Y]US2512052 (BROWN CLYDE A); | [Y]FR2273990 (GERDTS GUSTAV F KG [DE]); | [A]FR2175994 (SULZER AG [CH]); | [A]US2271411 (THWAITS FREDERICK G); | [A]GB922389 (ALGEMENE KUNSTZIJDE UNIE NV) |