EP0431897 - Rotary head recording and reproducing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.04.1996 [1996/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/24] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tanaka, Masato, c/o Patent Division Sony Corporation, 6-35-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141 / JP | [1991/24] | Representative(s) | Cotter, Ivan John, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/12] | Cotter, Ivan John, et al D. YOUNG & CO. 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | ||
Former [1991/24] | Thomas, Christopher Hugo, et al D. Young & Co, 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 90313161.3 | 04.12.1990 | [1991/24] | Priority number, date | JP19890318353 | 07.12.1989 Original published format: JP 31835389 | JP19900169078 | 26.06.1990 Original published format: JP 16907890 | [1991/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0431897 | Date: | 12.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0431897 | Date: | 18.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0431897 | Date: | 12.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G11B15/18, G11B15/467 | [1991/24] | CPC: |
G11B15/185 (EP,US);
G11B15/473 (KR);
G11B15/4676 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1991/24] | Title | German: | Aufzeichnungs- und Wiedergabegerät mit einem rotierenden Kopf | [1991/24] | English: | Rotary head recording and reproducing apparatus | [1991/24] | French: | Appareil d'enregistrement et de reproduction à tête rotative | [1991/24] | Examination procedure | 27.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/13] | 10.08.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP59146406 ; | [A]JP63317961 ; | [A]JP60107760 ; | [A]US3431353 (KIHARA NOBUTOSHI, et al); | [A]US3839730 (WATANABE Y); | [A]US4484235 (YOKOBORI NOBUYOSHI [JP], et al); | [A]US4672475 (NAKASHO TSUGUTADA [JP]); | [A]EP0276990 (SONY CORP [JP]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 8, no. 282 (P-323)(1719) 22 December 1984, & JP-A-59 146406 (SONY) 22 August 1984,, & JP59146406 A 19840822 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 159 (P-858) 18 April 1989, & JP-A-63 317961 (SHARP) 26 December 1988,, & JP63317961 A 19881226 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 259 (P-397) 17 October 1985, & JP-A-60 107760 (NIPPON DENKI) 13 June 1985,, & JP60107760 A 19850613 | [A] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS. vol. CE-25, no. 4, August 1979, NEW YORK US pages 440 - 445; MICHIO OZAWA: "NEW PORTABLE VIDEO CASSETTE RECORDER" |