EP0435493 - Medicine container and cover therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EATON FORMS CORPORATION 2280 Arbor Boulevard Dayton Ohio 45439 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/27] | For all designated states EATON FORMS CORPORATION 2280 Arbor Boulevard Dayton, Ohio 45439 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eaton, Rolland 423 Glendora Avenue Dayton, Ohio 45409 / US | [1991/27] | Representative(s) | Warren, Anthony Robert, et al Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith London W6 0LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/27] | Warren, Anthony Robert, et al BARON & WARREN, 18 South End, Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 90313281.9 | 06.12.1990 | [1991/27] | Priority number, date | US19890453934 | 20.12.1989 Original published format: US 453934 | [1991/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0435493 | Date: | 03.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0435493 | Date: | 27.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0435493 | Date: | 21.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B65D77/20, B65D77/30 | [1991/27] | CPC: |
B65D77/30 (EP,US);
B65D77/206 (EP,US);
B65D2577/2091 (EP,US);
Y10S206/807 (EP,US);
Y10S206/813 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1991/27] | Title | German: | Arzneimittelbehälter und Deckel dafür | [1991/27] | English: | Medicine container and cover therefor | [1991/27] | French: | Récipient pour médicaments et son couvercle | [1991/27] | Examination procedure | 15.04.1992 | Examination requested [1992/25] | 22.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.08.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.03.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 21.09.1994 | ES | 21.09.1994 | IT | 21.09.1994 | NL | 21.09.1994 | SE | 21.12.1994 | [2008/01] |
Former [2002/24] | BE | 21.09.1994 | |
ES | 21.09.1994 | ||
IT | 21.09.1994 | ||
NL | 21.09.1994 | ||
SE | 21.12.1994 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 21.09.1994 | |
IT | 21.09.1994 | ||
NL | 21.09.1994 | ||
SE | 21.12.1994 | ||
Former [1995/35] | BE | 21.09.1994 | |
NL | 21.09.1994 | ||
SE | 21.12.1994 | ||
Former [1995/29] | BE | 21.09.1994 | |
SE | 21.12.1994 | ||
Former [1995/27] | BE | 21.09.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3078986 (MEYER USHKOW); | [A]FR1330654 (CH GERVAIS AG) | Examination | US4860899 | EP0398316 | JPS59199463 |