EP0431951 - An atmospheric plasma reaction method and a device therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.09.1999 [1999/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Japan Science and Technology Corporation 1-8, Honcho 4-chome Kawaguchi-shi Saitama Prefecture / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/03] | For all designated states Japan Science and Technology Corporation 1-8, Honcho 4-chome Kawaguchi-shi, Saitama Prefecture / JP | ||
Former [1991/24] | For all designated states RESEARCH DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION OF JAPAN 5-2, Nagata-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Horiike, Yasuhiro Shatoburan, 603-7-10 Hikarigaoka Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima / JP | 02 /
Okazaki, Satiko 2-20-11, Takaido-higashi Suginnami, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Kogoma, Masuhiro 843-15, Shimoniikura Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | [1991/24] | Representative(s) | Calamita, Roberto, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/26] | Calamita, Roberto, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | ||
Former [1991/24] | Holmes, Michael John, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 90313288.4 | 07.12.1990 | [1991/24] | Priority number, date | JP19890318260 | 07.12.1989 Original published format: JP 31826089 | [1991/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0431951 | Date: | 12.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0431951 | Date: | 06.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0431951 | Date: | 07.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/32 | [1991/24] | CPC: |
H01J37/32009 (EP,US);
H01J37/32018 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, NL [1991/24] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät zur Plasmabehandlung unter atmosphärischem Druck | [1991/24] | English: | An atmospheric plasma reaction method and a device therefor | [1991/24] | French: | Méthode et appareil de traitement par plasma sous pression atmosphérique | [1991/24] | Examination procedure | 04.04.1992 | Examination requested [1992/23] | 10.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.02.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 02.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 26.01.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 24.04.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/39] | Request for further processing for: | 02.05.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 02.05.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.05.1996 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YP]EP0346055 (JAPAN RES DEV CORP [JP]); | [Y]US4554047 (COOK JOEL M [US], et al); | [A]US4381965 (MAHER JR JOSEPH A, et al) | [XP] - JOURNAL OF PHYSICS D. APPLIED PHYSICS. vol. 23, no. 8, August 14, 1990, LETCHWORTH GB pages 1125 - 1128; YOKOYAMA T ET AL.: 'The mechanism of the stabilisation of glow plasma at atmospheric pressure ' | [Y] - JOURNAL OF PHYSICS D. APPLIED PHYSICS. vol. 21, no. 21, May 14, 1988, LETCHWORTH GB pages 838 - 840; KANAZAWA S ET AL.: 'Stable glow plasma et atmospheric pressure ' | [Y] - PROCEEDINGS FOURTH INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON PLASMA CHEMISTRY vol. 2, 1979, ZüRICH, CH. pages 765 - 771; DONOHOE K G ET AL.: 'Plasma polymerisation of ethylene in an atmospheric pressure discharge ' |