EP0432988 - Hydrocarbylphenyl diaminodithiol derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.12.1994 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.02.1995 [1995/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMERSHAM INTERNATIONAL plc Amersham Place Little Chalfont Buckinghamshire HP7 9NA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/25] | For all designated states AMERSHAM INTERNATIONAL plc Amersham Place Little Chalfont Buckinghamshire HP7 9NA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McBride, William John 535 Bellevue No. 2 Oakland, California 94610 / US | 02 /
Baldwin, Ronald Martin 1674 Liana Lane Concord, California 94519 / US | 03 /
Kerr, Janice Marie 4790 Cherrywood Drive San Jose, California 95129 / US | 04 /
Schultze, Lisa Marie 4187 Maple Avenue Oakland, California 94607 / US | 05 /
Salazar, Nilda 2056 Pheasant Drive Hercules, California 94547 / US | 06 /
Chinitz, James Matthew 3957 Forest Hill Avenue Oakland, California 94602 / US | [1991/25] | Representative(s) | Pennant, Pyers, et al Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins Halton House 20/23 Holborn London EC1N 2JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/25] | Pennant, Pyers, et al Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 Serjeants' Inn Fleet Street London EC4Y 1LL / GB | Application number, filing date | 90313381.7 | 10.12.1990 | [1991/25] | Priority number, date | US19890445212 | 12.12.1989 Original published format: US 445212 | [1991/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0432988 | Date: | 19.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0432988 | Date: | 16.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C07C323/25, C07D285/00, C07C323/60, A61K49/02 | [1991/25] | CPC: |
C07D285/00 (EP);
A61K51/04 (EP);
C07C323/25 (EP);
C07C323/60 (EP);
C07F13/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/25] | Title | German: | Phenyldiaminodithiolderivate | [1991/25] | English: | Hydrocarbylphenyl diaminodithiol derivatives | [1991/25] | French: | Dérivés hydrocarbylphényles du diaminodithiol | [1991/25] | Examination procedure | 18.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/25] | 14.04.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.06.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.02.1994 | [1994/46] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0163119 (UNIV JOHNS HOPKINS [US]); | [X]EP0200492 (HARVARD COLLEGE [US], et al); | [A]EP0200211 (UNIV NEW YORK STATE RES FOUND [US]); | [A]EP0322876 (NIHON MEDIPHYSICS CO LTD [JP]) |