Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
16.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.03.1998 [1998/10] |
24.01.1997 | (Expected) grant | published on 12.03.1997 [1997/11] |
09.01.1997 | Renewal fee | |
18.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
02.08.1996 | Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
27.03.1996 | Communication of intention to grant | |
09.01.1996 | Renewal fee | |
15.12.1993 | First examination report | |
03.05.1991 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 19.06.1991 [1991/25] |
03.05.1991 | Request for examination filed | published on 19.06.1991 [1991/25] |