EP0433080 - Apparatus for measuring the mix ratio of a composite liquid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.01.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.03.1998 [1998/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NGK SPARK PLUG CO., LTD. 14-ban, 18-gou Takatsuji-cho Mizuho-Ku Nagoya-shi / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/25] | For all designated states NGK SPARK PLUG CO., LTD 14-ban, 18-gou Takatsuji-cho Mizuho-Ku Nagoya-shi / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miyata, Shigeru 14-ban, 18-gou, Takatsuji-cho Mizuho-ku, Nagoya-shi / JP | 02 /
Yamada, Yoshitaka 14-ban, 18-gou, Takatsuji-cho Mizuho-ku, Nagoya-shi / JP | [1991/25] | Representative(s) | Senior, Alan Murray, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/25] | Senior, Alan Murray, et al J.A. KEMP & CO., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 90313646.3 | 14.12.1990 | [1991/25] | Priority number, date | JP19890326585 | 15.12.1989 Original published format: JP 32658589 | [1991/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0433080 | Date: | 19.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0433080 | Date: | 08.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0433080 | Date: | 19.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/43, G01N21/85, // F02D41/00 | [1991/25] | CPC: |
G01N21/43 (EP,US);
G01N2201/0621 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [1991/25] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Messung des Mischungsverhältnisses mehrerer Flüssigkeiten | [1991/25] | English: | Apparatus for measuring the mix ratio of a composite liquid | [1991/25] | French: | Dispositif pour mesurer le rapport de mélange de plusieurs liquides | [1991/25] | Examination procedure | 10.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/32] | 13.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.09.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0292097 (NGK SPARK PLUG CO [JP]); | [Y]DE8807364U ; | [A]EP0281337 (NGK SPARK PLUG CO [JP]); | [A]US4770129 (MIYATA SHIGERU [JP], et al) | Examination | EP0337173 |