EP0433092 - Polarization converter having two converting devices therein [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.01.1995 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.03.1995 [1995/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 545-0013 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/25] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Enokuma, Shunji 16-16, Oonodai 3-chome Osaka-Sayama-shi, Osaka / JP | 02 /
Osabe, Yasuo 82-4, Higashisonoda-cho 2-chome Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo / JP | [1991/25] | Representative(s) | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/25] | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 90313700.8 | 14.12.1990 | [1991/25] | Priority number, date | JP19890324228 | 14.12.1989 Original published format: JP 32422889 | [1991/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0433092 | Date: | 19.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0433092 | Date: | 13.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q21/24, H01P1/161, H01P1/175 | [1991/25] | CPC: |
H01P1/161 (EP);
H01Q15/00 (KR);
H01P1/175 (EP);
H01Q21/245 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/25] | Title | German: | Polarisationswandler mit zwei umwandelnden Einrichtungen | [1991/25] | English: | Polarization converter having two converting devices therein | [1991/25] | French: | Convertisseur de polarisation avec deux dispositifs de conversion | [1991/25] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 21.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/25] | 20.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/09] | 05.10.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE8907672U ; | [X]EP0319753 (KATHREIN WERKE KG [DE]); | [A]GB891427 (GEN ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [A]US3166724 (ALLEN PHILIP J) |