EP0439949 - Manufacture of magnesium oxide containing beta"-aluminia sintered bodies [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1991/32] | Manufacture of magnesium oxide based beta"-alumina sintered bodies | ||
[1994/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.1995 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.04.1995 [1995/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NGK Insulators, Ltd. 2-56, Suda-Cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya City, Aichi Pref. / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/32] | For all designated states NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya City Aichi Pref. / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nemoto, Hiroshi 126, Myoen-cho, Minami-ku Nagoya City, Aichi Pref. / JP | 02 /
Takahashi, Tomonori 151 Aza-Kitabatake, Shinmaiko Chita City, Aichi Pref. / JP | [1991/32] | Representative(s) | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/06] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [1991/32] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward MEWBURN ELLIS 2 Cursitor Street London EC4A 1BQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 90314061.4 | 20.12.1990 | [1991/32] | Priority number, date | JP19900018484 | 29.01.1990 Original published format: JP 1848490 | [1991/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0439949 | Date: | 07.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/32] | Type: | A1 / A2 RE Reissue of A-publication | No.: | EP0439949 | Date: | 16.01.1992 | [1992/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0439949 | Date: | 27.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/10 | [1991/32] | CPC: |
C04B35/113 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/13] |
Former [1991/32] | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE | Title | German: | Herstellung von Sinterkörpern aus beta"-Aluminiumoxid enthaltend Magnesiumoxid | [1994/17] | English: | Manufacture of magnesium oxide containing beta"-aluminia sintered bodies | [1994/17] | French: | Fabrication de corps frittés en alumine bêta" contenant de l'oxyde de magnésium | [1991/32] |
Former [1991/32] | Herstellung von Sinterkörpern aus beta"-Aluminiumoxid auf der Basis von Magnesiumoxid | ||
Former [1991/32] | Manufacture of magnesium oxide based beta"-alumina sintered bodies | Examination procedure | 16.12.1991 | Examination requested [1992/09] | 14.05.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 20.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 26.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]GB1375167 ; | [X]US3895963 (MCGOWAN H CHRISTOPHER, et al) | [A] - ACADEMIE DES SCIENCES, COMPTES RENDUS, vol. 254, no. 3, 1962, pages 2782-2784; J. THERY et al.: "Chimie minérale. - Sur les propriétés d'un nouvel aluminate de sodium NaAl3O8" |