EP0444356 - Diffusion apparatus for semiconductors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.11.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.01.1994 [1994/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE CARBORUNDUM COMPANY 200 Public Square Cleveland Ohio 44114-2375 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/36] | For all designated states THE CARBORUNDUM COMPANY 200 Public Square Cleveland Ohio 44114-2375 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dalcin, James R. 3480 Wallace Drive Grand Island, New York 10494 / US | 02 /
Flemish, Joseph R. 529 Cumberland Street Westfield, New Jersey 07090 / US | 03 /
Rogers, Michael C. 6699 Rapids Road Lockport, New York 10494 / US | 04 /
Tressler, Richard E. 1040 Boalsburg Road Boalsburg, Pennsylvania 16827 / US | 05 /
Tworek, John L. 31 East Bihrwood Drive West Seneca, New York 14224 / US | 06 /
Viswanathan, Lakshminarayan 62 Bramhill Circle East Amherst, New York 14051 / US | [1991/36] | Representative(s) | Crack, Richard David, et al BP INTERNATIONAL LIMITED Patents Division Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames Middlesex TW16 7LN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/36] | Crack, Richard David, et al BP INTERNATIONAL LIMITED Patents Division Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames Middlesex TW16 7LN / GB | Application number, filing date | 90314082.0 | 20.12.1990 | [1991/36] | Priority number, date | US19890459050 | 29.12.1989 Original published format: US 459050 | [1991/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0444356 | Date: | 04.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0444356 | Date: | 30.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C30B31/00, C30B31/14 | [1991/36] | CPC: |
C30B31/14 (EP);
H01L21/22 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/36] | Title | German: | Diffusionsapparat für Halbleiter | [1991/36] | English: | Diffusion apparatus for semiconductors | [1991/36] | French: | Appareillage de diffusion pour semi-conducteurs | [1991/36] | File destroyed: | 27.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 31.03.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/01] | 09.08.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1994/01] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 28.05.1993 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1992 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4098923 (ALBERTI ROBERT STANLEY, et al); | [A]DE2642813 (SIEMENS AG); | [A]EP0140791 (BTU ENG CORP [US]); | [A]DE2129931 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN. vol. 13, no. 6, November 1970NEW YORK US pages 1446 - 1446A; R.L. MARSH ET AL: 'WAFER-SOURCE BOAT FOR CAPSULE DIFFUSION' |