EP0436367 - Process for the preparation of fire-retardant expandable thermoplastic beads [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.09.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.11.1996 [1996/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARCO Chemical Technology, L.P. Two Greenville Crossing, 4001 Kennett Pike, Suite 238 Greenville, Delaware 19807 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/37] | For all designated states ARCO Chemical Technology, L.P. Two Greenville Crossing 4001 Kennett Pike, Suite 238 Greenville, Delaware 19807 / US | ||
Former [1991/28] | For all designated states ARCO CHEMICAL TECHNOLOGY INC. 3 Christina Centre Suite 902 201 N Walnut Street Wilmington Delaware 19801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sonnenberg, Fred M. 50 Merbrook Lane Merion, Pennsylvania 19066 / US | 02 /
Hajnik, Dennis M. 472 Scott Drive West Chester, Pennsylvania 19380 / US | [1991/28] | Representative(s) | Cropp, John Anthony David, et al MATHYS & SQUIRE 100 Grays Inn Road London, WC1X 8AL / GB | [1991/28] | Application number, filing date | 90314113.3 | 21.12.1990 | [1991/28] | Priority number, date | US19890456400 | 26.12.1989 Original published format: US 456400 | [1991/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0436367 | Date: | 10.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0436367 | Date: | 02.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0436367 | Date: | 15.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C08J9/18, C08K5/06, C08L25/00 | [1991/28] | CPC: |
C08J9/18 (EP);
C08J9/00 (KR);
C08K5/06 (EP);
C08J2325/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/06, C08L25/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1991/28] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von feuerhemmenden expandierbaren thermoplastischen Perlen | [1991/28] | English: | Process for the preparation of fire-retardant expandable thermoplastic beads | [1991/28] | French: | Procédé pour préparer des perles expansibles thermoplastiques retardant la flamme | [1991/28] | Examination procedure | 25.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/17] | 05.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 09.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 09.05.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]AU547069 ; | [A]FR1596741 ; | [A]DE1946441 (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG) |