EP0438910 - A projection type display apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.02.1996 [1996/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 545-0013 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/31] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hamada, Hiroshi 7-177, Aoyama Nara-shi, Nara-ken / JP | [1991/31] | Representative(s) | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/31] | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 90314189.3 | 21.12.1990 | [1991/31] | Priority number, date | JP19890333131 | 21.12.1989 Original published format: JP 33313189 | [1991/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0438910 | Date: | 31.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0438910 | Date: | 07.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0438910 | Date: | 22.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H04N9/31 | [1991/31] | CPC: |
H04N9/3126 (EP);
G09F13/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1991/31] | Title | German: | Projektionsanzeigevorrichtung | [1991/31] | English: | A projection type display apparatus | [1991/31] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage du type par projection | [1991/31] | Examination procedure | 31.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/31] | 24.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.08.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP59007926 ; | [A]JP01103390 ; | [X]US4722593 (SHIMAZAKI TATSUO [JP]); | [Y]DE2829602 (SHARP KK); | [A]US3704936 (GORKIEWICZ WALTER JOSEPH, et al) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 92 (P-271)[1529], 27th April 1984; & JP-A-59 007 926 (RICOH K.K.) 17-01-1984, & JP59007926 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 13, no. 344 (E-797)[3692], 3rd August 1989; & JP-A-01 103 390 (SEIKO INSTR. & ELECTRON. IND.) 20-04-1989, & JP01103390 A 00000000 |