EP0435637 - Rotary damper [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.01.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.02.1996 [1996/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIHON PLAST CO., LTD. 218, Aoshima-cho Fuji-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/27] | For all designated states NIHON PLAST CO., LTD. 218, Aoshima-cho Fuji-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oosawa, Takafusa, c/o Nihon Plast Co., Ltd. 218, Aoshima-cho Fuji-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | [1991/27] | Representative(s) | Blanco White, Henry Nicholas, et al ABEL & IMRAY 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/27] | Blanco White, Henry Nicholas, et al ABEL & IMRAY Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 90314199.2 | 21.12.1990 | [1991/27] | Priority number, date | JP19890149645U | 26.12.1989 Original published format: JP 14964589 U | JP19900098415U | 19.09.1990 Original published format: JP 9841590 U | [1995/14] |
Former [1991/27] | JP19890149645U | 26.12.1989 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0435637 | Date: | 03.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0435637 | Date: | 04.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0435637 | Date: | 01.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F16F7/06, F16F13/00 | [1991/27] | CPC: |
F16F13/00 (EP,US);
F16F3/10 (EP,US);
F16F7/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/27] | Title | German: | Rotationsdämpfer | [1991/27] | English: | Rotary damper | [1991/27] | French: | Amortisseur de rotation | [1991/27] | Examination procedure | 17.08.1992 | Examination requested [1992/42] | 27.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.09.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.12.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1399795 (JOSEPH REIF); | [A]US1585797 |